IN SB0083 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each school corporation to include cursive writing in the curriculum of the school corporation.
Title
Cursive writing in school curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Schneider), prevailed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Schneider), prevailed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Thompson | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Rhoads | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 45 and nays 5 | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Randolph removed as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (Schneider), prevailed; Roll Call 92: yeas 27, nays 23 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | Senator Miller added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | Senators Grooms, Waterman, Gard, Becker, Randolph, Skinner, Steele, Smith and Arnold added as coauthors | |
2012-01-04 | Senator Delph added as third author | |
2012-01-04 | Senator Kruse added as second author | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Leising |