IN SB0079 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

1977 pension and disability fund. Establishes the 1977 fund defined contribution plan (plan). Provides that current employees may make contributions to the plan. Specifies rules and requirements for the plan concerning items that include member elections, member contributions, vesting, rollover distributions, and withdrawal of funds. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on pension management oversight.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

1977 pension and disability fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2022-01-18SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2022-01-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-06SenateSenator Qaddoura added as coauthor
2022-01-06SenateSenator Rogers added as third author
2022-01-06SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2022-01-04SenateSenator Ford Jon added as second author
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/79/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/7/1/a7713df6/SB0079.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/e/6/7de6c90e/SB0079.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/0/a/f90ac69f/SB0079.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/0/3/ce030c7f/SB0079.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/1/e/d31ece7f/SB0079.03.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/2/c/a42c221d/SB0079.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/0/c/7c0c218a/SB0079.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/a/7/bba71e5a/SB0079.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/2/3/1123273a/SB0079.02.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/2/cd22b980/SB0079.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/8/9/40891544/SB0079.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/6/2/8a62e631/SB0079.02.COMS.01.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback