IN SB0079 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "waste" for purposes of the limits the office of Medicaid policy and planning may put on drug use under the Medicaid program and the children's health insurance program. Allows the office of Medicaid policy and planning to restrict the use of certain drugs by individuals less than 18 years of age in certain circumstances.
Title
Mental health quality advisory committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 11 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 189: Yeas 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Simpson added as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsor: Rep. Noe | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 51: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-14 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2010-01-05 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Lawson |