IN SB0076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing. Makes dealing in a Schedule I or II narcotic drug as a Level 2 felony nonsuspendible if the person has a prior unrelated felony conviction for certain drug dealing offenses.
Title
Sentencing. Makes dealing in a Schedule I or II narcotic drug as a Level 2 felony nonsuspendible if the person has a prior unrelated felony conviction for certain drug dealing offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as author |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |