IN SB0073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School curriculum. Requires each school corporation and accredited nonpublic elementary school to include cursive writing in its curriculum. Requires each school corporation and accredited nonpublic school to include reading in its curriculum.
Title
School curriculum. Requires each school corporation and accredited nonpublic elementary school to include cursive writing in its curriculum. Requires each school corporation and accredited nonpublic school to include reading in its curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-08 | House | Representative Koch added as cosponsor |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Austin and Klinker |
2016-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 30, nays 18 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Smith added as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |