IN SB0062 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-05 - Bill Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-05 - Bill Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the legislative council shall assign the following topics to an interim study committee in 2012: (1) The advisability of creating an exemption from Indiana's securities laws for annual issues of securities whose aggregate value is less than approximately $1,000,000. (2) The advisability of providing for a form of business association, sometimes known as a flexible purpose corporation, which would allow the management of a profit seeking business to pursue an objective other than profit maximization without incurring liability for violation of the management's fiduciary duty.
Title
Securities and flexible purpose corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-06-30 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-06-24 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-06-20 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-06-15 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-06-09 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-06-03 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-05-28 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-05-24 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-05-19 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-05-15 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-05-10 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-05-05 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-30 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-26 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-21 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-17 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-13 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-09 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-05 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-04-01 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-03-27 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-03-23 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-03-19 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-03-14 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-03-10 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-03-05 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-02-24 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-02-19 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-02-07 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-01-31 | Bill Withdrawn | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-17 | Senator Delph added as first author | |
2012-01-17 | Senator Long removed as first author | |
2012-01-17 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Long |