IN SB0060 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 4 through 7 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 4 through 7 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that one executive session per calendar year may be held under the open door law to train members of a board of aviation commissioners or an airport authority board with an outside consultant about the performance of the role of the members as public officials. Specifies that the statutes governing public work projects by political subdivisions apply to contracts by a board of aviation commissioners or an airport authority board. Provides that an airport authority board may provide aviation services to public use airports within or outside Indiana either directly or through an affiliate entity established by the board. Provides that for purposes of the local public works statutes, bids may be opened after the time designated if: (1) the political subdivision makes a written determination that it is in the best interest of the political subdivision to delay the opening; and (2) the day, time, and place of the rescheduled opening are announced at the day, time, and place of the originally scheduled opening. Changes the membership of the board of the Indianapolis airport authority. Reduces the number of members appointed by the mayor of the consolidated city from six members to five members. Provides for the majority leader of the city-county council to appoint a member currently appointed by the county commissioners from one of the townships in which the airport is located. Increases the number of voting members by one member. Provides that the term of office of the member appointed by the county commissioners expires January 1, 2012. Provides that the appointment by the majority leader of the county legislative body is effective January 1, 2012. Provides that the individual appointed by the county commissioners and whose term expires January 1, 2012, may be reappointed by any public official who has appointment authority after December 31, 2011.
Title
Local government issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Pryor), failed (Y: 33 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed (Y: 36 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Hinkle), prevailed (Y: 55 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Pryor), failed (Y: 33 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed (Y: 36 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Hinkle), prevailed (Y: 55 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 4 through 7 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTION 3 effective 01/01/2012 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 1 through 2 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 139 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 731: yeas 59, nays 36 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 512: yeas 41, nays 9 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-29 | Senator Boots added as conferee | |
2011-04-29 | Senator Boots removed as advisor | |
2011-04-29 | Senator Breaux removed as conferee | |
2011-04-28 | Representative Behning added as conferee | |
2011-04-28 | Representative Behning removed as House advisor | |
2011-04-28 | Representative Pryor removed as conferee | |
2011-04-21 | House advisors appointed: Neese, Behning and Moses | |
2011-04-21 | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Pryor | |
2011-04-20 | Senate advisors appointed: Boots, R. Young and Smith | |
2011-04-20 | Senate conferees appointed: Lawson and Breaux | |
2011-04-19 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 474: yeas 74, nays 17 | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment 3 (Pryor), failed; Roll Call 463: yeas 33, nays 52 | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment 2 (Pryor), failed; voice vote | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed; Roll Call 462: yeas 36, nays 52 | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment 4 (Hinkle), prevailed; Roll Call 461: yeas 55, nays 33 | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-03 | Senator Boots added as second author | |
2011-02-03 | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-03 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Amendment 1 (Lawson C), prevailed; | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | Senator Arnold added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Lawson |