IN SB0043 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms matters. Removes penal facilities from the list of locations where employer ordinances, resolutions, policies, or rules prohibiting the keeping of firearms on employer property may be enforced. Provides that a penal facility shall require an employee to: (1) secure the employee's firearm or ammunition, or both, in a locked case; and (2) store the firearm or ammunition in the trunk or glove compartment or out of plain sight in the employee's locked vehicle. Permits certain employees of the general assembly and members of the Indiana lobby registration commission to carry a handgun within the state capitol building and on
Title
Firearms matters. Removes penal facilities from the list of locations where employer ordinances, resolutions, policies, or rules prohibiting the keeping of firearms on employer property may be enforced. Provides that a penal facility shall require an employee to: (1) secure the employee's firearm or ammunition, or both, in a locked case; and (2) store the firearm or ammunition in the trunk or glove compartment or out of plain sight in the employee's locked vehicle. Permits certain employees of the general assembly and members of the Indiana lobby registration commission to carry a handgun within the state capitol building and on
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Arnold L) failed (Y: 46 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Arnold L) failed (Y: 46 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Law 181 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 346: yeas 39, nays 7 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 330: yeas 76, nays 16 |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment #2 (Lucas) failed; voice vote |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Arnold L) failed; Roll Call 312: yeas 46, nays 47 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative Judy added as cosponsor |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senators Crane, Niemeyer, Koch, Walker, Messmer, Houchin, Freeman, Crider, Leising, Sandlin, Delph, Becker added as coauthors |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau, Hershman, Ford, Buck, Boots, Brown L, Eckerty, Young M added as coauthors |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Macer |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lucas |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 176: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Doriot added as coauthors |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |