IN SB0033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deposit of sex or violent offender fees.
Title
Deposit of sex or violent offender fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 26 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-18 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Lehman |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Senator Pete Miller added as first author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Senator Holdman removed as first author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |