IN SB0029 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School materials for juvenile detainees. Provides that, if a child is or will be detained in a juvenile detention facility (facility) for more than seven calendar days, the school corporation must, upon the child's parent or facility's request, provide to the facility the school materials for the grade level or courses that the child is or would be enrolled in if the child were not detained. Requires the school corporation, upon the child's parent or facility's request, to deliver the school materials at least once every seven calendar days, excluding any days that are not student instructional days. Provides that the school corporation may provide the school materials in an electronic format. Provides that, except for the assessment of rental fees for curricular materials, the school corporation is responsible for the costs associated with preparing and delivering the school materials. Provides that the school corporation is not required to provide the school materials if the: (1) child is released from the facility; or (2) facility requests that the school corporation no longer provide the school materials. Provides that if a student is suspended, the student is required to complete all assignments and school work assigned during the period of the student's suspension. Provides that the principal or the principal's designee shall ensure that the student receives notice of any assignments or school work due and teacher contact information in the event the student has questions regarding the assignments or school work. Provides that a school is required to provide a student who is expelled with a list of available alternative education programs or virtual charter schools which the student may attend during the student's expulsion. Provides that if a student is expelled from school or from any educational function, the student's absence from school because of the expulsion provisions requiring compulsory school attendance if the student may enroll in: (1) an alternative education program in the county or in a county immediately adjacent to the county containing the school corporation from which the student was expelled; or (2) a virtual charter school if the student does not enroll in a program or virtual charter school during the student's expulsion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School materials for juvenile detainees. Provides that, if a child is or will be detained in a juvenile detention facility (facility) for more than seven calendar days, the school corporation must, upon the child's parent or facility's request, provide to the facility the school materials for the grade level or courses that the child is or would be enrolled in if the child were not detained. Requires the school corporation, upon the child's parent or facility's request, to deliver the school materials at least once every seven calendar days, excluding any days that are not student instructional days. Provides that the school corporation may provide the school materials in an electronic format. Provides that, except for the assessment of rental fees for curricular materials, the school corporation is responsible for the costs associated with preparing and delivering the school materials. Provides that the school corporation is not required to provide the school materials if the: (1) child is released from the facility; or (2) facility requests that the school corporation no longer provide the school materials. Provides that if a student is suspended, the student is required to complete all assignments and school work assigned during the period of the student's suspension. Provides that the principal or the principal's designee shall ensure that the student receives notice of any assignments or school work due and teacher contact information in the event the student has questions regarding the assignments or school work. Provides that a school is required to provide a student who is expelled with a list of available alternative education programs or virtual charter schools which the student may attend during the student's expulsion. Provides that if a student is expelled from school or from any educational function, the student's absence from school because of the expulsion provisions requiring compulsory school attendance if the student may enroll in: (1) an alternative education program in the county or in a county immediately adjacent to the county containing the school corporation from which the student was expelled; or (2) a virtual charter school if the student does not enroll in a program or virtual charter school during the student's expulsion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenatePublic Law 94
2019-04-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 411: yeas 42, nays 6
2019-04-04SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-19HouseRepresentatives Pfaff and Cook added as cosponsors
2019-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 320: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-03-18HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-18SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Clere
2019-02-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 26, nays 21
2019-02-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-31SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/29/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/7/e/aa7e7422/SB0029.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/3/2/8632476c/SB0029.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/b/6/8bb6b889/SB0029.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/a/9/51a955d1/SB0029.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/3/e/553e9612/SB0029.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/c/c/eecccc97/SB0029.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/4/e/254e0fb7/SB0029.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/2/a/3e2a34c7/SB0029.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/1/7/861791f3/SB0029.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/1/e/f11e989e/SB0029.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/5/d/195de1c3/SB0029.121.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/c/2/10c21fa5/SB0029.02.COMS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/d/c/6fdc9f76/SB0029.320.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/2/1/6f21a1df/SB0029.411.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback