IN SB0024 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the "mental health and addiction advisory council" the "mental health and addiction planning and advisory council" and adds members to consolidate the current council with a body required by federal law. Repeals provisions concerning terms of appointed members and repeals a provision that applies general rules for family and social services administration bodies to the planning and advisory council. Removes a provision under which lay members of the commission on mental health and addiction are ineligible for per diem or traveling expenses. Provides that superintendents of state hospitals serve at the will of the director of the division of mental health and addiction and not for a term of four years. Removes provisions requiring bonds for superintendents of state operated facilities. Gives the director of the division of mental health and addiction instead of the superintendent of each hospital the authority to regulate smoking at state hospitals. Requires individuals applying for a social worker, marriage and family therapist, or counselor license to have a criminal history background check. Clarifies a provision that requires an applicant for a license as a marriage and family therapist to have two years of postdegere clinical experience. Reestablishes a provision that expired in 2011 concerning exempting certain individuals from the licensure requirement for addiction counselors. Repeals obsolete provisions concerning: (1) the dawn project; (2) the biennial opioid report; (3) the closing of Central State Hospital; (4) mandated bond requirements for superintendents of state hospitals; and (5) the definition of "maintain". Makes conforming changes. Urges the assignment to an interim committee the study of the regulation of pain management facilities and prescribers of controlled substances. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the commission on mental health and addiction.)
Title
Mental health issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-28 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 256: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2012-02-22 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment 1 (Riecken), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-01-24 | Cosponsors: Reps. C. Brown and T. Brown | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Noe | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-23 | Amendment 2 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Amendment 1 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Simpson added as second author | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Lawson |