IN SB0014 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various criminal law matters. Makes the offense of child exploitation a Level 4 felony instead of a Level 5 felony if the offense involves, depicts, or describes a child less than 18 years of age who: (1) engages in bestiality; (2) is mentally disabled or deficient; (3) participates in the sexual conduct, matter, performance, or incident by use of force or the threat of force; (4) physically or verbally resists participating in the sexual conduct, matter, performance, or incident; (5) receives a bodily injury while participating in the sexual conduct, matter, performance, or incident; or (6) is less than 12
Title
Various criminal law matters. Makes the offense of child exploitation a Level 4 felony instead of a Level 5 felony if the offense involves, depicts, or describes a child less than 18 years of age who: (1) engages in bestiality; (2) is mentally disabled or deficient; (3) participates in the sexual conduct, matter, performance, or incident by use of force or the threat of force; (4) physically or verbally resists participating in the sexual conduct, matter, performance, or incident; (5) receives a bodily injury while participating in the sexual conduct, matter, performance, or incident; or (6) is less than 12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 13 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 439: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 399: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Washburne, Mahan, Lawson L and Pierce |
2016-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Eberhart and Hale |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Young R Michael, Taylor and Leising |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Head and Randolph Lonnie M |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Representative McNamara added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | House | Amendment #1 (Price) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | House | Amendment #2 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Representatives Hale and Mahan added as cosponsors |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Leising added as third author |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reread second time: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senators Buck and Randolph added as coauthors |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senators Bassler and Brown L added as coauthors |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as coauthor |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senators Houchin, Taylor, Tomes, Raatz added as coauthors |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second author |