IN SB0009 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Target shooting. Provides that a person who goes to a shooting range that is, or whose instructors and range safety officers are, certified by a nationally recognized shooting organization, and that posts and maintains signage concerning liability for the purpose of target shooting does not have an assurance that the premises is safe for that purpose.
Title
Target shooting.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Rep. Chris May [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative May |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 41, nays 9 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |