IN SB0005 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Powers of Appointment Act. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on courts and the judiciary or another appropriate interim study committee the topic of the Uniform Powers of Appointment Act, as approved and recommended by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws.
Title
Uniform Powers of Appointment Act. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on courts and the judiciary or another appropriate interim study committee the topic of the Uniform Powers of Appointment Act, as approved and recommended by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second author |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Representative Washburne added as sponsor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |