IN HR0021 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Representative Frye added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A HOUSE RESOLUTION urging national policy makers to adopt an energy approach that increases United States energy security, achieves North American energy independence, ensures the availability of needed pipelines and infrastructure, stimulates the United States economy, and creates American jobs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A HOUSE RESOLUTION urging national policy makers to adopt an energy approach that increases United States energy security, achieves North American energy independence, ensures the availability of needed pipelines and infrastructure, stimulates the United States economy, and creates American jobs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - House - House - First reading: adopted (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Utilities and Energy - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor.
2014-02-26HouseFirst reading: adopted Roll Call 296: yeas 79 and nays 14
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative Morrison added as coauthor.
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative Frizzell added as coauthor.
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative Battles added as coauthor.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-20HouseReassigned to Utilities and Energy
2014-02-11HouseAuthored by Representative Koch.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback