IN HJR0006 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Public Law 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Public Law 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Town and city court judges. Provides that the judge of a city or town court shall reside in: (1) the county in which the city or town court is located; or (2) the bordering Indiana county that is the closest Indiana county to the city or town in which the court is located. This proposed amendment has not been previously agreed to by a general assembly.
Title
Town and city court judges.
Sponsors
Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Chris Jeter [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Public Law 254 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second sponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-16 | House | Representatives Negele and Jeter C added as coauthors |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Aylesworth |