IN HJR0006 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Public Law 231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Public Law 231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that only marriage between one man and one woman shall be valid or recognized as a marriage in Indiana. Provides that a legal status identical or substantially similar to that of marriage for unmarried individuals shall not be valid or recognized. This proposed amendment has not been previously agreed to by a general assembly.
Title
Marriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Austin), failed (Y: 32 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Austin), failed (Y: 32 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Public Law 231 | |
2011-04-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-03-30 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-03-29 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 40 and nays 10 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed; Roll Call 286: yeas 11, nays 36 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed; Roll Call 285: yeas 11, nays 36 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Senators Yoder, Schneider, Smith and Buck added as cosponsors | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Banks and Tomes | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 70, nays 26 | |
2011-02-14 | Representatives Behning, Borders, Bosma, T. Brown, Burton, Davis, Dodge, Espich, Foley, Friend, Frizzell, R. Frye, Gutwein, Heaton, Heuer, Koch, Lehe, Lehman, Lutz, McClain, Messmer, Morris, Neese, Noe, Pond, Richardson, M. Smith, Speedy, Thompson, Ubelhor, Wesco and Yarde added as coauthors | |
2011-02-14 | House Rule 106.1 suspended | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment 1 (Austin), failed; Roll Call 134: yeas 32, nays 60 | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-07 | Representatives Culver and Stemler added as coauthors | |
2011-02-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-20 | Coauthored by Representative Cheatham | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Turner |