IN HCR0040 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-33)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Representatives Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Boy, Brown, T., Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Chyung, DeLaney, Deal, Dvorak, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Hostettler, Huston, Jackson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Moed, Morris, Morrison, Moseley, Nisly, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Saunders, Shackleford, Smaltz, Smith, V., Soliday, Stutzman, Sullivan, Summers, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins, Wright, Young J, Ziemke added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-33)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Representatives Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Boy, Brown, T., Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Chyung, DeLaney, Deal, Dvorak, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Hostettler, Huston, Jackson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Moed, Morris, Morrison, Moseley, Nisly, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Saunders, Shackleford, Smaltz, Smith, V., Soliday, Stutzman, Sullivan, Summers, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins, Wright, Young J, Ziemke added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing dyslexia in Hoosier youth.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing dyslexia in Hoosier youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Representatives Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Boy, Brown, T., Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Chyung, DeLaney, Deal, Dvorak, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Hostettler, Huston, Jackson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Moed, Morris, Morrison, Moseley, Nisly, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Saunders, Shackleford, Smaltz, Smith, V., Soliday, Stutzman, Sullivan, Summers, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins, Wright, Young J, Ziemke added as coauthors |
2020-03-03 | House | Representatives Abbott D, Baird, Barrett, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Goodrich, Heaton, Lyness, Macer, McNamara, Miller, Negele, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Sherman D, Steuerwald, Thompson, Torr, Vermilion A, Zent added as coauthors |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Houchin |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/house/concurrent/40/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/0/6/0806fcb5/HC0040.01.INTR.pdf |