IN HCR0019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a portion of State Road 62 in Jefferson County in honor of James Pendleton, Sr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a portion of State Road 62 in Jefferson County in honor of James Pendleton, Sr.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-21HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation voice vote
2019-02-21HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback