IN HCR0018 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION terminating the public health emergency first declared on March 6, 2020, in Executive Order 20-02.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION terminating the public health emergency first declared on March 6, 2020, in Executive Order 20-02.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as coauthor
2021-04-05HouseRepresentative Ledbetter C added as coauthor
2021-03-29HouseRepresentative Zent added as coauthor
2021-03-29HouseRepresentative Jordan added as coauthor
2021-03-25HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as coauthor
2021-03-25HouseRepresentative Teshka J added as coauthor
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Wesco added as coauthor
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as coauthor
2021-03-18HouseRepresentative Slager added as coauthor
2021-03-15HouseRepresentatives Young J and Miller added as coauthors
2021-03-11HouseRepresentatives Snow C and Frye added as coauthors
2021-03-08HouseRepresentatives Manning and Barrett added as coauthors
2021-03-04HouseRepresentatives Davis M and Goodrich added as coauthors
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2021-03-01HouseCoauthored by Representatives Lucas, Payne, Hostettler, May, Speedy, Baird, Eberhart, Jeter, King, Ellington, Morris, Lindauer, Judy, Morrison, Borders, Abbott, Lauer
2021-03-01HouseAuthored by Representative Prescott

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback