IN HCR0018 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging the Indiana General Assembly to fly the POW/MIA flag in both Chambers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the Indiana General Assembly to fly the POW/MIA flag in both Chambers.

Sponsors

Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. Ronald Bacon [R]Rep. James Baird [R]Rep. Jeb Bardon [D]
Rep. John Bartlett [D]Rep. Kreg Battles [D]Rep. Patrick Bauer [D]Rep. Robert Behning [R]
Rep. Bruce Borders [R]Rep. Brian Bosma [R]Rep. Timothy Brown [R]Rep. Timothy Brown [R]
Rep. Charles Burton [R]Rep. Dave Cheatham [D]Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Edward Clere [R]
Rep. William Crawford [D]Rep. Suzanne Crouch [R]Rep. Wes Culver [R]Rep. Bill Davis [R]
Rep. Steven Davisson [R]Rep. John Day [D]Rep. Edward DeLaney [D]Rep. Nancy Dembowski [D]
Rep. Thomas Dermody [R]Rep. Chester Dobis [D]Rep. Richard Dodge [R]Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D]
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]Rep. Sue Ellspermann [R]Rep. Jeffrey Espich [R]Rep. Ralph Foley [R]
Rep. William Friend [R]Rep. David Frizzell [R]Rep. Craig Fry [D]Rep. Randall Frye [R]
Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]Rep. Terry Goodin [D]Rep. Floyd Grubb [D]Rep. Doug Gutwein [R]
Rep. Earl Harris [D]Rep. Robert Heaton [R]Rep. Kathleen Heuer [R]Rep. Phillip Hinkle [R]
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]Rep. Clyde Kersey [D]Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R]Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]
Rep. Thomas Knollman [R]Sen. Eric Koch [R]Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R]Rep. Linda Lawson [D]
Rep. Donald Lehe [R]Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Jack Lutz [R]
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R]Rep. Richard McClain [R]Rep. Judson McMillin [R]Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]
Sen. Mark Messmer [R]Rep. Robert Morris [R]Rep. Charles Moseley [D]Rep. Winfield Moses [D]
Rep. Timothy Neese [R]Sen. David Niezgodski [D]Rep. Cynthia Noe [R]Rep. Scott Pelath [D]
Rep. Phil Pflum [D]Rep. Matt Pierce [D]Rep. Phyllis Pond [R]Rep. Gregory Porter [D]
Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]Rep. Mara Reardon [D]Rep. Scott Reske [D]Rep. Rhonda Rhoads [R]
Rep. Kathy Richardson [R]Rep. Gail Riecken [D]Rep. Thomas Saunders [R]Rep. Vernon Smith [D]
Rep. Vernon Smith [D]Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]Rep. Mike Speedy [R]Rep. Steven Stemler [D]
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R]Rep. Dan Stevenson [D]Rep. Mary Sullivan [D]Rep. Vanessa Summers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]Rep. Gerald Torr [R]Rep. Randy Truitt [R]Rep. Eric Turner [R]
Rep. Matthew Ubelhor [R]Rep. Rochelle VanDenburgh [D]Rep. Heath VanNatter [R]Rep. Peggy Welch [D]
Rep. Timothy Wesco [R]Rep. Mike White [?]Rep. David Wolkins [R]Rep. David Yarde [R]

Roll Calls

2012-03-05 - House - House - Second reading: adopted Roll Call 325: yeas 94, nays 0 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Returned to the House
2012-03-06 First reading: adopted voice vote
2012-03-05 Senate sponsors: Senators Tallian and Arnold
2012-03-05 Referred to the Senate
2012-03-05 Second reading: adopted Roll Call 325: yeas 94, nays 0
2012-02-21 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 Referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2012-02-09 Coauthored by Representatives Gutwein, Austin, Bacon, Baird, Bardon, Bartlett, Battles, Bauer, Behning, Borders, Bosma, C. Brown, T. Brown, Burton, Candelaria Reardon, Cheatham, Cherry, Clere, Crawford, Crouch, Culver, Davis, Davisson, Day, DeLaney, Dembowski, Dermody, Dobis, Dodge, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellspermann, Espich, Foley, Friend, Frizzell, C. Fry, R. Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Grubb, Harris, Heaton, Heuer, Hinkle, Karickhoff, Kersey, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Knollman, Koch, Kubacki, L. Lawson, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lutz, Mahan, McClain, McMillin, McNamara, Messmer, Morris, Moses, Neese, Niezgodski, Noe, Pelath, Pflum, Pierce, Pond, Porter, Pryor, Reske, Rhoads, Richardson, Riecken, Saunders, M. Smith, V. Smith, Soliday, Speedy, Stemler, Steuerwald, Stevenson, Sullivan, Summers, Thompson, Torr, Truitt, Turner, Ubelhor, VanDenburgh, VanNatter, Welch, Wesco, White, Wolkins and Yarde
2012-02-09 Authored by Representative Moseley

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback