IN HCR0014 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that section of U.S. Highway 30 from the intersection with Pioneer Road in Plymouth to the intersection with Oak Road in Marshall County the "Ralph 'Ray' Reed, Jr. Memorial Drive".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that section of U.S. Highway 30 from the intersection with Pioneer Road in Plymouth to the intersection with Oak Road in Marshall County the "Ralph 'Ray' Reed, Jr. Memorial Drive".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Deal added as coauthor
2019-02-12HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-02-12HouseCoauthored by Representative Pressel
2019-02-12HouseAuthored by Representative Jordan

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback