IN HCR0006 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S. Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge". A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S. Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
Title
Urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S. Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading: adopted standing vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-24 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2023-01-19 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 12: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation voice vote |
2023-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |