IN HCR0005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Senator Steele added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Senator Steele added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the United States government to cease mandates.
Title
Urging the United States government to cease mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House - Roll Call 392 (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Senator Steele added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-29 | Senator Walker added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-29 | Returned to the House | |
2011-04-29 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to the Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure. | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appointments and Claims | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Buck and Waltz | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 392: yeas 70, nays 17 | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor | |
2011-02-15 | Representatives Foley and Behning added as coauthors | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Frizzell |