IN HB1594 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - House advisors appointed: Brown T, Cherry and Porter
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Indiana finance authority matters. Provides that any proposed extension or amendment to certain public-private agreements that: (1) makes a substantial change to: (A) the scope of the public-private agreement; or (B) the uses of the revenue generated under the public-private agreement; or (2) results in a positive, new revenue impact of at least $1,000,000 under the public-private agreement being amended or extended shall be submitted to the state budget committee for review. Prohibits any extension or amendment to such a public-private agreement until after the state budget committee has reviewed the proposed extension or amendment. Allows the chairman of the state budget committee to waive these requirements. Specifies that any lump sum amounts or series of amounts totaling more than $1,000,000 received under such a public-private agreement must be held in reserve until May 1 of the calendar year following the calendar year in which the lump sum payment was received.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana finance authority matters. Provides that any proposed extension or amendment to certain public-private agreements that: (1) makes a substantial change to: (A) the scope of the public-private agreement; or (B) the uses of the revenue generated under the public-private agreement; or (2) results in a positive, new revenue impact of at least $1,000,000 under the public-private agreement being amended or extended shall be submitted to the state budget committee for review. Prohibits any extension or amendment to such a public-private agreement until after the state budget committee has reviewed the proposed extension or amendment. Allows the chairman of the state budget committee to waive these requirements. Specifies that any lump sum amounts or series of amounts totaling more than $1,000,000 received under such a public-private agreement must be held in reserve until May 1 of the calendar year following the calendar year in which the lump sum payment was received.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseHouse advisors appointed: Brown T, Cherry and Porter
2019-04-16HouseHouse conferees appointed: Huston and DeLaney
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Rogers, Breaux and Holdman
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Mishler and Niezgodski
2019-04-15HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-15HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 445: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-04SenateAmendment #3 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseCosponsor: Senator Holdman
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Mishler, Niezgodski and Tallian
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representatives Porter, DeLaney and Brown T
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Huston

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1594/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/8/d/b28dff51/HB1594.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/4/a/094a4473/HB1594.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/c/e/59ceda80/HB1594.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/2/5/5a25c2a3/HB1594.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/b/a/5fba49b3/HB1594.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/3/3/bc33c180/HB1594.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/8/2/4a827b92/HB1594.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/7/7/d2776a63/HB1594.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/5/a/625abf2f/HB1594.200.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/9/4/0f947e71/HB1594.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/0/f/360f4780/HB1594.445.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback