IN HB1592 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Public Law 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Automobile sales requirements. Provides that a manufacturer may sell directly to the general public only if the manufacturer was granted its initial license to sell new motor vehicles before July 1, 2015, and has established a warranty repair center in Indiana before January 1, 2018. Provides that a manufacturer may no longer sell directly to the general public if the manufacturer sells, conveys, or transfers a majority interest to another person that is required to be registered under this chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automobile sales requirements. Provides that a manufacturer may sell directly to the general public only if the manufacturer was granted its initial license to sell new motor vehicles before July 1, 2015, and has established a warranty repair center in Indiana before January 1, 2018. Provides that a manufacturer may no longer sell directly to the general public if the manufacturer sells, conveys, or transfers a majority interest to another person that is required to be registered under this chapter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HousePublic Law 260
2017-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 427: yeas 43, nays 5
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenator Zay added as cosponsor
2017-02-20SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2017-02-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-07HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Hershman, Crider and Niezgodski
2017-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 77, nays 20
2017-02-06HouseRepresentatives Frye and Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors
2017-02-06HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-24HouseRepresentatives Morris and Smith, V. added as coauthors
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2017-01-23HouseCoauthored by Representative GiaQuinta
2017-01-23HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1592/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/f/e/55fe0e6c/HB1592.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/d/9/43d9e348/HB1592.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/7/9/06796475/HB1592.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/b/b/d3bb3dde/HB1592.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/3/a/9d3a64ce/HB1592.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/9/2/919246ee/HB1592.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/f/c/cefcee85/HB1592.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/3/7/d437a2f5/HB1592.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/b/3/3eb3a357/HB1592.81.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/6/b/e36b2cec/HB1592.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/d/f/b6df1f86/HB1592.427.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback