IN HB1571 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Autopsy reports. Allows a coroner, in certain circumstances, to make available an autopsy report to the peer review committee of a hospital at which the decedent was treated immediately before death.
Title
Autopsy reports. Allows a coroner, in certain circumstances, to make available an autopsy report to the peer review committee of a hospital at which the decedent was treated immediately before death.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 160 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 464: yeas 87, nays 2 |
2017-03-30 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second sponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Becker |
2017-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative Bacon |
2017-01-23 | House | Authored by Representative Hatfield |