IN HB1548 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the uniform foreign country money judgments recognition act. Provides a process for recognizing money judgments obtained in other nations for the purpose of enforcement.
Title
Recognition of foreign country money judgments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 213 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 677: yeas 91, nays 0 | |
2011-03-08 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 31 and nays 17 | |
2011-03-07 | Amendment 1 (Bray), prevailed; | |
2011-03-07 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-03 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-08 | Representatives McMillin and Pryor added as coauthors | |
2011-02-08 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray, Simpson and Head | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-02-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Foley |