IN HB1539 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Securities. Provides that living residents of bankrupt continuing care retirement communities who executed a continuing care agreement before July 1, 2009, are eligible to receive distributions from the guaranty association fund. (Current law provides that any living resident of a bankrupt continuing care retirement community is eligible to receive distributions from the guaranty association fund.) Removes a provision that provides that IC 4-21.5 (laws governing administrative orders and proceedings) does not apply to certain provisions regulating loan brokers. Removes certain provisions concerning transactions involving securities that are exempt from registration. Provides that IC 4-21.5 (laws governing administrative orders and proceedings)
Title
Securities. Provides that living residents of bankrupt continuing care retirement communities who executed a continuing care agreement before July 1, 2009, are eligible to receive distributions from the guaranty association fund. (Current law provides that any living resident of a bankrupt continuing care retirement community is eligible to receive distributions from the guaranty association fund.) Removes a provision that provides that IC 4-21.5 (laws governing administrative orders and proceedings) does not apply to certain provisions regulating loan brokers. Removes certain provisions concerning transactions involving securities that are exempt from registration. Provides that IC 4-21.5 (laws governing administrative orders and proceedings)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 160 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 308: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-03 | House | Senator Holdman added as sponsor |
2015-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Negele added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Heaton |