IN HB1528 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Next generation Hoosier educators scholarship program. Provides that an individual enrolled in a transition to teaching program may apply for a one time scholarship under the next generation Hoosier educators scholarship program. Establishes requirements to qualify for the one time scholarship. Provides that the maximum amount of a scholarship is $10,000. Provides that the total annual amount of scholarships awarded from the next generation Hoosier educators scholarship fund to individuals enrolled in a transition to teaching program may not exceed $1,000,000. Requires that an awarded scholarship must be repaid under certain conditions.
Title
Next generation Hoosier educators scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 242 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 447: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2023-04-18 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Johnson |
2023-02-14 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Holdman, Brown L |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-06 | House | Representatives Jordan, Goodrich, Klinker added as coauthors |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Heine |
Subjects
HIGHER EDUCATION, Adult Education
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
LICENSES AND LICENSING
SCHOOLS, Teachers
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
LICENSES AND LICENSING
SCHOOLS, Teachers
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS