IN HB1519 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Donations of agricultural products and livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Donations of agricultural products and livestock.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 155
2013-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 548: yeas 81, nays 0
2013-03-26SenateSenator Crider added as cosponsor
2013-03-25SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 46 and nays 0
2013-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-18SenateSenator Arnold added as second sponsor
2013-03-18SenateSenator Holdman added as cosponsor
2013-03-05SenateSenator R. Young added as cosponsor
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2013-02-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker
2013-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-18HouseRepresentatives Bauer and Steuerwald added as coauthors
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative M. Smith

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback