IN HB1501 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Invasive species council. Extends the expiration date of the invasive species council from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2023. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invasive species council. Extends the expiration date of the invasive species council from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2023. Makes technical changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15HousePublic Law 27
2015-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-17SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-17SenateSenators Tomes and Stoops added as cosponsor
2015-03-16SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-03-12SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-09SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2015-02-10HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-09HouseSenator Mrvan added as cosponsor
2015-02-09HouseSenator Bray added as third sponsor
2015-02-09HouseSenator Glick added as second sponsor
2015-02-09HouseSenator Leising added as sponsor
2015-02-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-02-05HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2015-01-20HouseCoauthored by Representatives Lehe, Heaton, Niezgodski
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative Baird

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1501/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/c/a/ebca710c/HB1501.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/a/7/dda7fdaf/HB1501.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/f/9/e3f980a0/HB1501.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/4/b/034b6ed6/HB1501.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/c/1/44c196a5/HB1501.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/9/b/9f9bbc6c/HB1501.04.ENRH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/b/6/b0b67162/HB1501.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/b/a/16ba68ff/HB1501.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/b/7/a1b73f61/HB1501.103.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/f/3/4df38e00/HB1501.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/7/e/587ead10/HB1501.292.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback