IN HB1489 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clark County taxes. Provides that the county council of Clark County may adopt a resolution authorizing the county executive to appeal to the department of local government finance to increase the county's maximum permissible property tax levy for 2018 in an amount equal to: (1) the amount of the Judgment Funding Bonds of 2016 issued by the county; multiplied by (2) a percentage specified in the resolution adopted by the county council and agreed to in a resolution adopted by the county executive, but not to exceed 100%. Reduces the maximum permissible property tax levy for the county in certain
Title
Clark County taxes. Provides that the county council of Clark County may adopt a resolution authorizing the county executive to appeal to the department of local government finance to increase the county's maximum permissible property tax levy for 2018 in an amount equal to: (1) the amount of the Judgment Funding Bonds of 2016 issued by the county; multiplied by (2) a percentage specified in the resolution adopted by the county council and agreed to in a resolution adopted by the county executive, but not to exceed 100%. Reduces the maximum permissible property tax levy for the county in certain
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Sen. James Smith [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] |
Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 199 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 537: yeas 87, nays 9 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 516: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Grooms, Tallian and Merritt |
2017-04-12 | House | House advisors appointed: Davisson, Candelaria Reardon and Goodin |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Smith J and Stoops |
2017-04-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown T and Stemler |
2017-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 423: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second sponsor |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senator Grooms removed as cosponsor |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Smith J) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as cosponsor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Smith J |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 77, nays 15 |
2017-02-23 | House | Representative Clere removed as coauthor |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-18 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Stemler and Clere |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Brown T |