IN HB1485 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the interim study committee (committee) on medical reimbursement of worker's compensation and sets topics of study for the committee. Requires the committee to operate under the policies governing study committees adopted by the legislative council.
Title
Worker's compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 366: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 1 (Riecken), withdrawn | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Lehman |