IN HB1480 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employee of a local health department to conduct an onsite soil evaluation concerning the repair or replacement of a failed residential onsite sewage system if: (1) the employee was hired by the local health department before January 1, 2013; (2) the local health board has determined that the employee has the necessary knowledge of the principles of soil science as acquired by professional education; (3) the employee uses guidelines set forth in the soil manuals, technical bulletins, and handbooks of the Natural Resources Conservation Service of the United States Department of Agriculture; and (4) the employee files a written report with the local health department for each onsite soil evaluation conducted by the employee.
Title
Residential onsite sewage systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 10 |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 34 and nays 14 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Leising |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 72, nays 17 |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Lehman and Battles |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins |