IN HB1467 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Senator Crider added as second sponsor
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Senator Crider added as second sponsor
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Community mental health center matters. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to apply for a Medicaid state plan amendment or Medicaid waiver for the following: (1) Reimbursement of Medicaid rehabilitation option services for a Medicaid eligible recipient who is undertaking an initial assessment, intake, or counseling in a community mental health center. (2) Reimbursement for Medicaid rehabilitation option services concurrently with reimbursement under the residential addiction treatment program. (3) The inclusion of video conferencing and audio services as telehealth for community mental health centers. Amends the definition of "telehealth services" for the Medicaid program. Requires at least two members of the division of mental health and addiction planning and advisory council to be community mental health center chief executive officers or designees. Requires the department of child services to accept certain criminal history checks and fingerprinting performed by community mental health centers for specified professionals if the process used by the community mental health center at least meets or exceeds the department's procedures. Amends the required graduate level courses and clinical experience that an applicant is required to obtain for a license as a clinical addiction counselor. Adds two members to the justice reinvestment advisory council. Makes a conforming change.
Title
Community mental health center matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second sponsor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-15 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2021-02-15 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2021-02-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-09 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Davisson |