IN HB1458 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Doctor scope of treatment and do not resuscitate. Provides that a declarant may include a person for whom a proxy has executed an out of hospital do not resuscitate (DNR) declaration if the person: (1) is at least 18 years of age and is certified as a qualified person; (2) is incapacitated or incompetent; and (3) has no representative who is able and available to execute an out of hospital DNR declaration. Defines "incapacitated" as related to an out of hospital DNR declaration. Defines "proxy" as related to an out of hospital DNR declaration and a physician order for scope of treatment (POST). Provides that a person's proxy may execute an out of hospital DNR declaration if certain conditions are met. Creates a declaration and order form to be used by hospitals if the declarant is incapacitated or incompetent. Allows a qualified person's proxy to complete a POST form if the person is incapable of making health care decisions and no representative is able and available to act. Allows a proxy to revoke a POST form or request alternative treatment. Provides that if alternative treatment is requested, the treating medical provider shall review the POST form with the declarant, the declarant's representative, or the proxy who has priority to act for the declarant. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Doctor scope of treatment and do not resuscitate.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Cory Criswell [R] |
Sen. Tyler Johnson [R] | Sen. Scott Alexander [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Public Law 86 |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 326: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2023-03-27 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senator Alexander added as second sponsor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as third sponsor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-30 | House | Representatives Hatfield and Criswell C added as coauthors |
2023-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2023-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Johnson |
2023-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Barrett |
2023-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative Fleming |
Subjects
DEATH
HEALTH, Health Care Professionals
HOSPITALS AND MEDICAL FACILITIES
HUMAN SERVICES
MEDICAL ISSUES generally
HEALTH, Health Care Professionals
HOSPITALS AND MEDICAL FACILITIES
HUMAN SERVICES
MEDICAL ISSUES generally