IN HB1452 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Natural resources matters. Allows the department of administration to sell abandoned railroad corridor property to an adjacent landowner under certain conditions. Adds supplies purchased for resale at properties owned or managed by the department of natural resources (department) to the purchases exempt from the public purchasing requirements. Allows the state forester to use a geographic information system for classified land inspections if a landowner chooses to not accompany the state forester on the inspection. Provides that certain information concerning an endangered species may be kept confidential. Allows the director of the department to issue an order vacating a public highway
Title
Natural resources matters. Allows the department of administration to sell abandoned railroad corridor property to an adjacent landowner under certain conditions. Adds supplies purchased for resale at properties owned or managed by the department of natural resources (department) to the purchases exempt from the public purchasing requirements. Allows the state forester to use a geographic information system for classified land inspections if a landowner chooses to not accompany the state forester on the inspection. Provides that certain information concerning an endangered species may be kept confidential. Allows the director of the department to issue an order vacating a public highway
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Clyde Kersey [D] | Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 155 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 515: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 357: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Mrvan added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Glick added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Representatives Kersey, Arnold, Goodin added as coauthors |
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Eberhart |