IN HB1440 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Loan brokers. Reorganizes current provisions regulating loan brokers and moves the reorganized provisions to a new article, including: (1) the loan broker regulation account; (2) licensure and notice requirements; (3) education and examination requirements for licensure; (4) requirements for loan broker offices, personnel, and conduct of business; and (5) violations and enforcement. Makes conforming amendments. Repeals the current law regulating loan brokers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loan brokers. Reorganizes current provisions regulating loan brokers and moves the reorganized provisions to a new article, including: (1) the loan broker regulation account; (2) licensure and notice requirements; (3) education and examination requirements for licensure; (4) requirements for loan broker offices, personnel, and conduct of business; and (5) violations and enforcement. Makes conforming amendments. Repeals the current law regulating loan brokers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 175
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-19SenateSenator Gaskill added as second sponsor
2019-03-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-04HouseRepresentatives Hamilton, Schaibley, Heine added as coauthors
2019-02-04HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Bassler
2019-02-04HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-01-31HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-29HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
2019-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Heaton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1440/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/2/e/e12ea08c/HB1440.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/9/8/85987fc3/HB1440.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/3/9/7f397ff5/HB1440.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/0/4/85041a04/HB1440.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/7/8/ef784cd1/HB1440.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/e/c/ffec047d/HB1440.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/c/f/30cf394f/HB1440.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/3/1/e9316cb2/HB1440.90.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/3/7/da37a8e5/HB1440.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/2/b/e02b30f6/HB1440.300.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback