IN HB1422 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trafficking of harmful substances in jails. Defines "chemical intoxicant" and increases the penalty for trafficking with an inmate if the trafficked article is a chemical intoxicant.
Title
Trafficking of harmful substances in jails.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitch Gore [D] | Rep. Kyle Pierce [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] |
Sen. Cyndi Carrasco [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Public Law 71 |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Glick added as cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Zay added as third sponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second sponsor |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Carrasco |
2024-01-29 | House | Representative Negele added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Representative Moseley added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | House | Representative Pierce K added as coauthor |
2024-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2024-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Gore |