IN HB1416 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Magistrates. Allows a magistrate to: (1) approve and accept criminal plea agreements; (2) approve agreed settlements concerning civil matters; and (3) approve decrees of dissolution, settlement agreements, and any other agreements of the parties in domestic relations actions or paternity actions. Allows the judges of the Marion superior court to appoint four additional full-time magistrates after December 31, 2015.
Title
Magistrates. Allows a magistrate to: (1) approve and accept criminal plea agreements; (2) approve agreed settlements concerning civil matters; and (3) approve decrees of dissolution, settlement agreements, and any other agreements of the parties in domestic relations actions or paternity actions. Allows the judges of the Marion superior court to appoint four additional full-time magistrates after December 31, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Kirchhofer and Pryor |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |