IN HB1415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various natural resources matters. Adds certain structures that are eligible for institutional road fund money on department of natural resources (DNR) properties. Amends the definition of "operate" for purposes of the operation of a motorboat near a shore line. Authorizes the DNR to adopt emergency rules related to the regulation of water recreation. Provides that certain fees concerning fish and wildlife, entomology and plants, water resources, lakes and reservoirs, dams, flood control, mineral extraction, channels, and well drillers and pump installers are considered to be minimum fees. Allows the natural resources commission to set certain license and permit fees above
Title
Various natural resources matters. Adds certain structures that are eligible for institutional road fund money on department of natural resources (DNR) properties. Amends the definition of "operate" for purposes of the operation of a motorboat near a shore line. Authorizes the DNR to adopt emergency rules related to the regulation of water recreation. Provides that certain fees concerning fish and wildlife, entomology and plants, water resources, lakes and reservoirs, dams, flood control, mineral extraction, channels, and well drillers and pump installers are considered to be minimum fees. Allows the natural resources commission to set certain license and permit fees above
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Clyde Kersey [D] | Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] | Rep. Sue Errington [D] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Goodin) prevailed (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Goodin) prevailed (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 195 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 539: yeas 90, nays 8 |
2017-04-21 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Messmer and Mrvan |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Glick and Tallian |
2017-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Morrison, Friend and Errington |
2017-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Eberhart and Kersey |
2017-04-17 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 41, nays 8 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Glick |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 81, nays 7 |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment #2 (Goodin) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment #1 (Goodin) prevailed; Roll Call 85: yeas 52, nays 43 |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | House | Representatives Arnold and Errington added as coauthors |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2017-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative Kersey |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Eberhart |