IN HB1408 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Nonresidential on-site sewage system permit. Requires the state department of health to grant or deny an application for a permit to construct a nonresidential on-site sewage system within 45 days after the permit application is submitted to the state department.
Title
Nonresidential on-site sewage system permit. Requires the state department of health to grant or deny an application for a permit to construct a nonresidential on-site sewage system within 45 days after the permit application is submitted to the state department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Eckerty and Kruse |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | House | Representative Bauer added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Wesco |