IN HB1394 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Women's suffrage centennial commission. Establishes the Indiana women's suffrage centennial commission (commission). Provides that the commission shall seek to promote activities that commemorate the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. Establishes the Indiana women's suffrage centennial commission fund to pay for special projects of the commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Women's suffrage centennial commission. Establishes the Indiana women's suffrage centennial commission (commission). Provides that the commission shall seek to promote activities that commemorate the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. Establishes the Indiana women's suffrage centennial commission fund to pay for special projects of the commission.

Sponsors

Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. Karlee Macer [D]Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]Rep. Holli Sullivan [R]
Rep. David Abbott [R]Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. Ronald Bacon [R]Rep. Beau Baird [R]
Rep. Patrick Bauer [D]Rep. Lisa Beck [D]Rep. Mara Reardon [D]Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R]
Rep. Chris Chyung [D]Rep. Edward Clere [R]Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Ross Deal [D]
Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D]Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]Rep. Sue Errington [D]Rep. Dan Forestal [D]
Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]Rep. Terry Goodin [D]Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]Rep. Earl Harris [D]
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D]Rep. Matt Hostettler [R]Rep. Christopher Judy [R]Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R]
Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]Rep. Jim Lucas [R]Rep. Ethan Manning [R]Rep. Chris May [R]
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]Rep. Robert Morris [R]Rep. Curt Nisly [R]
Rep. Vernon Smith [D]Rep. Christy Stutzman [R]Rep. Vanessa Summers [D]Rep. Melanie Wright [D]
Rep. Dennis Zent [R]Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D]Rep. Robin Shackleford [D]
Rep. John Bartlett [D]Sen. Jean Breaux [D]Sen. Jean Leising [R]Sen. Ronnie Alting [R]
Sen. Jon Ford [R]Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D]Sen. Timothy Lanane [D]Sen. Susan Glick [R]
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R]Sen. Victoria Spartz [R]Sen. Linda Rogers [R]Sen. Rodric Bray [R]
Sen. James Merritt [R]Sen. Mark Messmer [R]Sen. Mike Bohacek [R]Sen. Jack Sandlin [R]
Sen. Andy Zay [R]Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R]Sen. J.D. Ford [D]Sen. Eddie Melton [D]
Sen. Karen Tallian [D]Sen. Greg Taylor [D]Sen. David Niezgodski [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 87
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenators Ford J.D., Melton, Tallian, Taylor G, Niezgodski added as cosponsors
2019-04-08SenateSenators Bray, Merritt, Messmer, Bohacek, Sandlin, Zay, Ruckelshaus added as cosponsors
2019-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 391: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-02SenateSenators Becker, Spartz, Rogers added as cosponsors
2019-04-01SenateSenators Lanane and Glick added as cosponsors
2019-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenator Alting added as cosponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-02-01HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Bartlett added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Jackson added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-01-31HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Breaux and Leising
2019-01-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-01-29HouseRepresentatives Abbott D, Austin, Bacon, Baird, Bauer, Beck, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Deal, Dvorak, Eberhart, Errington, Forestal, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Hamilton, Harris, Hatfield, Hostettler, Judy, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Nisly, Smith, V., Stutzman, Summers, Wright, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
2019-01-29HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-22HouseRepresentative Sullivan added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Macer and Pryor
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Negele

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1394/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/b/5/fab57bc2/HB1394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/e/b/19eb4351/HB1394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/8/5/9c85c687/HB1394.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/e/4/8fe4a926/HB1394.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/9/1/b5910f55/HB1394.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/e/e/fdeeb503/HB1394.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/4/8/f848d0d8/HB1394.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/5/1/5f51b3d5/HB1394.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/2/a/0b2a169b/HB1394.78.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/6/b/ea6ba2a7/HB1394.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/6/2/6062d870/HB1394.391.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback