IN HB1374 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Performance and payment bonds. Provides that for public-private BOT agreements, public-private agreements for toll road projects, and public-private partnership agreements for transportation projects entered into after June 30, 2019, a performance bond must be for not less than 50% of the cost to design and construct the project and a payment bond must be for not less than 100% of the cost to design and construct the project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Performance and payment bonds. Provides that for public-private BOT agreements, public-private agreements for toll road projects, and public-private partnership agreements for transportation projects entered into after June 30, 2019, a performance bond must be for not less than 50% of the cost to design and construct the project and a payment bond must be for not less than 100% of the cost to design and construct the project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 208
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenator Crider added as second sponsor
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 405: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Doriot
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 93, nays 2
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseRepresentatives Soliday and Frye added as coauthors
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseReassigned to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1374/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/9/7/f997f6e6/HB1374.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/7/8f27e01d/HB1374.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/6/b/ba6b4834/HB1374.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/b/6/6ab6a97b/HB1374.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/0/9/5409afe7/HB1374.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/2/1/14215848/HB1374.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/c/9/07c921f6/HB1374.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/8/4/ae84ea58/HB1374.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/4/3/79433888/HB1374.230.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/4/e/a14e6320/HB1374.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/f/2/14f2adb6/HB1374.405.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback