IN HB1373 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans matters. Extends employment protections under the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act and extends the rights, benefits, and protections under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to members of the national guard of another state during state sponsored activation. Allows an individual (and the individual's dependent) who is: (1) an active member of the armed services of the United States or the national guard; (2) a legal Indiana resident; (3) assigned for duty or deployed outside Indiana; and (4) eligible for Medicaid waiver services or Medicaid assistance; to resume Medicaid eligibility and remain on Medicaid waiver waiting lists.
Title
Veterans matters. Extends employment protections under the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act and extends the rights, benefits, and protections under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to members of the national guard of another state during state sponsored activation. Allows an individual (and the individual's dependent) who is: (1) an active member of the armed services of the United States or the national guard; (2) a legal Indiana resident; (3) assigned for duty or deployed outside Indiana; and (4) eligible for Medicaid waiver services or Medicaid assistance; to resume Medicaid eligibility and remain on Medicaid waiver waiting lists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Public Law 116 |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 383: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Banks) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Tomes and Messmer |
2016-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | House | Representatives Bartlett and Harman added as coauthors |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2016-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Borders |