IN HB1372 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various insurance matters. Requires a state employee health plan, a policy of accident and sickness insurance, and a health maintenance organization contract to provide coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections (PANDAS) and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome (PANS), including treatment with intravenous immunoglobulin therapy. Makes changes in the law concerning the permissible investments of life insurance companies and casualty, fire, and marine insurance companies. Provides that an insurance administrator may pay claims via electronic payment. Exempts an individual from the prelicensing course, state license examination, and continuing education requirements for licensed independent adjusters if the individual holds a current claims certification issued by a national or state claims association whose certification program meets certain conditions. Provides that a multiple employer welfare arrangement may be established through an interlocal cooperation agreement. Adopts the insurance data security model law, which requires certain holders of an insurance license, authority, or registration to maintain an information security program and meet other requirements. Establishes an affirmative defense to a tort civil action for a licensee that satisfies the requirements of the insurance data security model law. Adopts a new model law on credit for reinsurance. Provides that a rejection of uninsured motorist coverage or underinsured motorist coverage in an underlying personal policy is also a rejection of uninsured motorist coverage or underinsured motorist coverage in a personal umbrella or excess liability policy. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying medical payment coverage, including: (1) whether medical payment coverage should be supplemental to the benefits: (A) to which a covered individual is entitled under a health plan; and (B) that are the same as or similar to benefits available to the covered individual under the medical payment coverage; and (2) whether a health plan should be prohibited from requiring the use or exhaustion of medical payment coverage as a condition of payment of benefits under the health plan for health care services rendered to a covered individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various insurance matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Niezgodski) prevailed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 130
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 396: yeas 45, nays 4
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 393: yeas 88, nays 3
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Zay and Breaux
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bassler and Niezgodski
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Judy, Lehman, Borders, Heaton and Campbell
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 316: yeas 45, nays 3
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #6 (Niezgodski) prevailed; Roll Call 252: yeas 32, nays 14
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #7 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #5 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #4 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-25SenateSenator Zay added as second sponsor
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Lehman and Austin added as coauthors
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Bassler
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1372/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/b/8/bcb8e7f2/HB1372.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/c/4/6ec4f1b4/HB1372.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/6/2/5b62da30/HB1372.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/a/8/c1a822f5/HB1372.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/c/5/9bc5af77/HB1372.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/c/e/3ace0f41/HB1372.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/9/7/9a97e9ff/HB1372.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/2/6/93264431/HB1372.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/5/1/6351a8b8/HB1372.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/7/1/4071ba33/HB1372.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/5/1/9351ca04/HB1372.113_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/e/8/10e85d5e/HB1372.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/8/c/ab8cda9b/HB1372.252_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/d/0/a6d01ffb/HB1372.316_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/7/e/997ea19a/HB1372.393_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/4/3/3c432009/HB1372.396_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback