IN HB1368 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Representative M. Smith added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Representative M. Smith added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Automated traffic enforcement safety devices.
Title
Automated traffic enforcement safety devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendment 1 (Soliday), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2013-02-14 | House | Representative Friend added as coauthor |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |