IN HB1355 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Township merger pilot program. Establishes a pilot program that provides for: (1) the merger of townships into a single township government in Blackford County and Switzerland County; and (2) the merger of townships into not more than two township governments in Crawford County.
Title
Township merger pilot program.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Chris May [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Chris Campbell [D] |
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 80, nays 15 |
2023-02-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Representative Campbell added as coauthor |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |
2023-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representatives May and Engleman |