IN HB1353 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Religious use property tax exemption. Requires a sales disclosure form to include an attestation that a property transferred will continue to be used by a church or religious society for the same tax exempt purpose. Provides that a county assessor that reasonably suspects that property transferred is no longer being used by a church or religious society for the same tax exempt purpose may request articles of incorporation or bylaws to confirm the attestation included in the sales disclosure form. Provides that the request for articles of incorporation or bylaws to confirm the attestation must: (1) be made in writing; and (2) include a written explanation of the assessor's reasonable suspicion describing why the assessor believes that the property transferred is no longer being used by the church or religious society for the same tax exempt purpose. Specifies that the provisions in the bill apply to transactions occurring after December 31, 2021. Provides that when an exempt property owned by a church or religious society is transferred to another church or religious society to be used for the same exempt purpose, the transferee church or religious society is not required to file an exemption application with the county assessor. Provides that if the property remains eligible for the exemption, the exempt status carries over to the transferee church or religious society.
Title
Religious use property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Porter) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Porter) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 192 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 486: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 492: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin and Niezgodski |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Qaddoura |
2021-04-05 | House | House advisors appointed: Thompson, Rowray, DeLaney and Pfaff |
2021-04-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Speedy and Porter |
2021-03-30 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Sandlin |
2021-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 69, nays 24 |
2021-02-08 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 81: yeas 28, nays 67 |
2021-02-08 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 80: yeas 29, nays 63 |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |